MO SB527 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a majority of the circuit and associate circuit judges of the 22nd Judicial Circuit sitting en banc must appoint the sheriff of the City of St. Louis
Title
Specifies that a majority of the circuit and associate circuit judges of the 22nd Judicial Circuit sitting en banc must appoint the sheriff of the City of St. Louis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 527-Keaveny |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4603881 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB527.pdf |