MO SB529 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Missouri Public Prompt Payment Act and the law relating to public works projects
Title
Modifies the Missouri Public Prompt Payment Act and the law relating to public works projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-27 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-20 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(4629S02.01S) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor, with SCS |
2014-01-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (4629S.02C) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 529-Wallingford |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |