MO SB531 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 531-Wallingford, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to child custody arrangements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to child custody arrangements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 531-Wallingford, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
2020-03-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-03-04SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(3527S03.04S)
2020-03-04SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Schupp)--(3527S03.02S)
2020-03-04SenateSS S offered (Wallingford)--(3527S.03F)
2020-03-03SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-02-13SenateReported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2020-02-12SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2020-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 531-Wallingford
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback