MO SB549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Missouri Works Training Program and Missouri Works programs
Title
Reauthorizes the Missouri Works Training Program and Missouri Works programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 549 (*HA 1 HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 549 (*HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 549 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 549 (*HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 549 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (4475S.02C) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 549-Wasson |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |