MO SB569 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - In Conference--SB 569-Cunningham, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR and passed CCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - In Conference--SB 569-Cunningham, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR and passed CCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to trusts and estates
Title
Modifies provisions relating to trusts and estates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: SB 569 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | In Conference--SB 569-Cunningham, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR and passed CCS) |
2018-05-10 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-10 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Cunningham) |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | H distributes CCR (4967S05.01F) |
2018-04-24 | House | House conferees appointed: Fraker, Redmon, Cornejo, Mitten, McCreery |
2018-04-24 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Cunningham, Wieland, Crawford, Walsh, Sifton |
2018-04-24 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-04-19 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-04-18 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(4967H02.01H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 569-Cunningham |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |