MO SB599 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-05-18 | CCR H adopted (4467S02.1SR) | |
2012-05-17 | H submits CCR | |
2012-05-17 | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-05-17 | CCR S offered & adopted (4467S02.1SR) | |
2012-05-16 | H conferees appointed: Dieckhaus, Stream, Fitzwater, Lampe, Aull | |
2012-05-16 | S conferees appointed: Schaefer, Pearce, Kehoe, Keaveny, Chappelle-Nadal | |
2012-05-16 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2012-05-15 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2012-05-15 | S refuses to concur in HAs | |
2012-05-15 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted | |
2012-05-15 | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Franz)--(4467S01.03F) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 4, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-15 | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(4467S01.10H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 4 H offered (Burlison)--(4467S01.02H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 3, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-15 | HA 3 to HA 3 H offered & Ruled out of order (Hough)--(4467S01.11H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 2 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Neth)--(4467S01.09H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Bahr)--(4467S01.08H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 3 H offered (Stream)--(4467S01.01F) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 2, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-15 | HA 1 to HA 2 H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(4467S01.07H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 2 H offered (Smith-150)--(4467S01.06H) | |
2012-05-15 | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(4457S01.02F) | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-25 | Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-18 | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-12 | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-03-30 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-29 | H First Read | |
2012-03-29 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Perfected | |
2012-03-22 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-29 | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 599-Schaefer |