MO SB608 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding sovereign immunity and the liability of property owners when criminal conduct occurs on the property
Title
Modifies provisions regarding sovereign immunity and the liability of property owners when criminal conduct occurs on the property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 113 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: SB 608 (*HA 1 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: SB 608 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 608 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: SB 608 (*HA 1 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: SB 608 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-17 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2018-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Hoskins) |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-15 | House | H distributes CCR (458906S.01F) |
2018-05-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Cornejo, Houx, Franks Jr., Ellebracht |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Hoskins, Munzlinger, Wieland, Sifton, Rizzo |
2018-05-02 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-04-26 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-04-24 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS H adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | HA 3, as amended, H defeated |
2018-04-24 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(4589H05.07H) |
2018-04-24 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Franks Jr.)--(4589H05.01H) |
2018-04-24 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Schroer)--(4589H05.10H) |
2018-04-24 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Fitzwater)--(4589H05.11H) |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2018-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2018-03-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Litigation Reform |
2018-02-27 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-26 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-22 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(4589S.04F) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 608-Hoskins |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |