MO SB62 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding various pension systems and forfeiture of a pension benefit due to a felony conviction
Title
Modifies provisions regarding various pension systems and forfeiture of a pension benefit due to a felony conviction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 62 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 62 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 62 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 62 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SB 62 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0457S09.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | H distributes CCR (0457S09.1SR) |
2017-05-08 | House | S conferees appointed: Hegeman, Cunningham, Munzlinger, Hummel, Schupp |
2017-05-08 | House | H conferees appointed: Black, Walker-3, Pike, Morgan, Brown-27 |
2017-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-04-26 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS, as amended, adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0457H07.02H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(0457H07.13H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bernskoetter)--(0457H07.01H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(0457H07.03H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pike)--(0457H07.05H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 1, as amended, to HCS H adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(0457H07.25H) |
2017-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Black)--(0457H07.20H) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Pensions |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Pensions |
2017-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Pensions |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred H Pensions |
2017-03-13 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-09 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-09 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-03-07 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(0457S.05F) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 62-Hegeman |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |