MO SB620 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions related to health and life insurance
Title
Modifies various provisions related to health and life insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] | Sen. Scott Rupp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading, with HCS | |
2012-05-07 | Laid over (H) | |
2012-05-07 | Taken up for Third Reading (H) | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-24 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee | |
2012-04-23 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee | |
2012-04-23 | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Insurance Policy Committee | |
2012-03-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-22 | H First Read | |
2012-03-22 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Perfected | |
2012-03-20 | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(4661S01.01S) | |
2012-03-01 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-28 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-01-09 | S First Read--SB 620-Rupp |