MO SB623 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Raises taxes on fuels and increases fuel decal fees
Title
Raises taxes on fuels and increases fuel decal fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (In Fiscal Review) |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-05-04 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2016-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation w/Amendments |
2016-04-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2016-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SS S adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Brown)--(4763S04.01S) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SS S offered (Libla)--(4763S.04F) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 623-Libla |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |