MO SB623 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to child protection
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to child protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Children and Families |
2020-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Children and Families |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred H Children and Families |
2020-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2020-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (White)--(3325S02.09S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3325S02.10S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SS S offered (Libla)--(3325S.02F) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 623-Libla |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |