MO SB624 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the crimes of stealing and fraudulent procurement of a credit or debit device
Title
Modifies the crimes of stealing and fraudulent procurement of a credit or debit device
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - House: SB 624 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-04-27 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-04-27 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Banking |
2016-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Banking |
2016-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Banking |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Banking |
2016-04-12 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Parson)--(4888S02.01S) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 624-Libla |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |