MO SB627 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - In Conference--SB 627-Nasheed, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended, HA 5 & HA 6 (Further conference granted)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - In Conference--SB 627-Nasheed, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended, HA 5 & HA 6 (Further conference granted)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public institution of higher education to develop and implement a policy to advise students and staff on available suicide prevention programs
Title
Requires each public institution of higher education to develop and implement a policy to advise students and staff on available suicide prevention programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 627 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 627 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 627 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 627 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 627 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | In Conference--SB 627-Nasheed, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended, HA 5 & HA 6 (Further conference granted) |
2016-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | H distributes CCR#2 |
2016-05-12 | House | S conferees appointed: Nasheed, Schupp, Pearce, Romine, Riddle |
2016-05-12 | House | H conferees appointed: English, Solon, Frederick, Dunn, Mims |
2016-05-12 | House | H grants further conference |
2016-05-12 | House | S requests further conference |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Nasheed, Schupp, Pearce, Romine, Riddle |
2016-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: English, Solon, Frederick, Dunn, Mims |
2016-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HAs 1, 2, 3, 4, as amended, 5 & 6 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC defeated |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Wood)--(4501S01.42H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Sommer)--(4501S01.09H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 4, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(4501S01.46H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 4 H offered (Frederick)--(4501S01.23H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Lauer)--(4501S01.45H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Solon)--(4501S01.03H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Mims)--(4501S01.08H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee - Consent |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 627-Nasheed |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |