MO SB645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 645-Hoskins, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 645-Hoskins, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to services for certain students
Title
Modifies provisions relating to services for certain students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 645-Hoskins, with SCS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3776S.03C) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 645-Hoskins |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |