MO SB648 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 648-Dempsey, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 648-Dempsey, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies law on temporary instruction permits, towing companies, and use of ignition interlock devices by drunk drivers
Title
Modifies law on temporary instruction permits, towing companies, and use of ignition interlock devices by drunk drivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 648-Dempsey, with HCS, as amended | |
2012-05-17 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-17 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-17 | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Meadows)--(4676L05.14H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gatschenberger)--(4676L05.19H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(4676L05.10H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gosen)--(4676L05.02H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(4676L05.15H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(4676L05.17H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shumake)--(4676L05.08H) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(4676L05.01F) | |
2012-05-17 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Conway)--(4676L05.16H) | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-02 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-12 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-05 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-01 | H First Read | |
2012-03-01 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Perfected | |
2012-02-28 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-15 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (4676S.03C) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-11 | S First Read--SB 648-Dempsey |