MO SB664 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies corporate registration report requirements for authorized farm corporations and family farm corporations
Title
Modifies corporate registration report requirements for authorized farm corporations and family farm corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: SB 664 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2016-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2016-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2016-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 664-Parson |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |