MO SB674 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2018-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2018-04-17 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-16 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-04-10 | Senate | SS#2 S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(4409S.08F) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Schaaf)--(4409S07.04S) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | SS S offered (Koenig)--(4409S.07F) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 674-Koenig |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |