MO SB690 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to public safety
Title
Modifies provisions related to public safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-26 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2012-04-26 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-05 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-01 | H First Read | |
2012-03-01 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Perfected | |
2012-02-21 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-16 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2012-02-14 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - Consent | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2012-01-24 | S First Read--SB 690-Engler |