MO SB696 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 696-Schaefer, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 696-Schaefer, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to motor vehicles
Title
Modifies provisions relating to motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 696-Schaefer, with HCS, as amended |
2014-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(5024H03.01H) |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Cancelled H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee to Floor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 696-Schaefer |