MO SB754 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Executive Session Scheduled H Judiciary--(12:00 p.m. or Upon adjournment - HR 1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Executive Session Scheduled H Judiciary--(12:00 p.m. or Upon adjournment - HR 1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Executive Session Scheduled H Judiciary--(12:00 p.m. or Upon adjournment - HR 1) |
2024-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2024-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(3102S.07F) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(3102S06.04S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3102S.06F) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 754, 746, 788, 765, 841, 887, 861) Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3102S.03C) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |