MO SB769 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 769-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 769-Pearce, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plans cover diagnosis and treatment of eating disorders
Title
Requires health benefit plans cover diagnosis and treatment of eating disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 769-Pearce, with SCS |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (5560S.02C) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 769-Pearce |