MO SB788 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires course materials and instruction relating to human sexuality and sexually transmitted diseases to contain information about sexual harassment, sexual violence, and consent
Title
Requires course materials and instruction relating to human sexuality and sexually transmitted diseases to contain information about sexual harassment, sexual violence, and consent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 788-Nasheed |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69511792 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB788.pdf |