MO SB802 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to business investment incentives
Title
Modifies provisions relating to business investment incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-18 | House | Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy |
2024-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-02-28 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Bernskoetter)--(3920S03.09S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3920S03.05S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | SS S offered (Trent)--(3920S.03F) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |