MO SB806 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to children who are victims of pornographic offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to children who are victims of pornographic offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Bartle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred H Crime Prevention Committee | |
2010-03-01 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-25 | H First Read | |
2010-02-25 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Perfected | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-08 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2010-01-20 | S First Read--SB 806-Bartle |