MO SB833 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to financial transactions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to financial transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 833 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 833 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 (HA 1 HSA 1 HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 128 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 833 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 (HA 1 HSA 1 HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 128 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 833 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(5460S.05S) |
2016-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted--(5460S05.1SR) |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Nasheed, Holsman, Cunningham, Wallingford, Silvey |
2016-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Fitzwater (49), McGaugh, Hill, LaFaver, Otto |
2016-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Love)--(5460H02.02H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS H defeated |
2016-05-09 | House | HSA 1 for HA 5 to HCS H withdrawn |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5460H02.16H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HSA 1 for HA 5 to HCS H offered (McCreery)--(5460H02.07H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Rowden)--(5460H02.04H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (LaFaver)--(5460H02.10H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(5460H02.09H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(5460H02.14H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5460H02.01H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2016-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2016-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 833-Nasheed |
2015-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled |