MO SB833 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the definition of "electric plant" to include electric vehicle charging stations
Title
Modifies the definition of "electric plant" to include electric vehicle charging stations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 833-Rowden |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=70472822 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB833.pdf |