MO SB845 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the membership and duties of the Task Force on the Prevention of Sexual Abuse of Children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the membership and duties of the Task Force on the Prevention of Sexual Abuse of Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-02-21SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-02-07SenateHearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-01-18SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 845-Riddle
2018-01-02SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback