MO SB848 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 848-Barnitz, with HCS#2, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 848-Barnitz, with HCS#2, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions pertaining to utilities, energy, and animal care
Title
Modifies various provisions pertaining to utilities, energy, and animal care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 848-Barnitz, with HCS#2, as amended | |
2010-05-12 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-12 | HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-12 | HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Schlottach)--(4632L04.16H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 3 to HCS#2 H offered & defeated (Harris)--(4632L04.01L) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Guernsey)--(4632L04.15H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Schad)--(4632L04.19H) | |
2010-05-04 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-05-04 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-03 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2010-05-03 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Returned to the committee of origin | |
2010-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-26 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2010-04-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2010-04-06 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-01 | H First Read | |
2010-04-01 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected | |
2010-03-30 | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Bray)--(4632S01.01S) | |
2010-03-25 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor | |
2010-03-24 | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2010-01-28 | S First Read--SB 848-Barnitz |