MO SB867 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contains provisions relating to fire protection, sheltered workshops, assessments of mining property, consolidation of road districts, and property managers
Title
Contains provisions relating to fire protection, sheltered workshops, assessments of mining property, consolidation of road districts, and property managers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 867 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 867 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 867 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 106 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 (HA 19, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 867 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 867 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 106 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 (HA 19, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 867 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(5606S.05S) |
2016-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted --(5606S05.1SR) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-03 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Schmitt, Riddle, Keaveny, Curls |
2016-05-03 | House | H conferees appointed: Fitzpatrick, Jones, Rowden, McCreery, Butler |
2016-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-03 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed, EC defeated |
2016-05-02 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 19 to HCS, as amended H adopted |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HA 19 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(5606H03.50H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 19 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(5606H03.49H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 19 to HCS H offered (Corlew)--(5606H03.27H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (English)--(5606H03.21H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Koenig)--(5606H03.35H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5606H03.09H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(5606H03.16H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Miller)--(5606H03.44H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lant)--(5606H03.28H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(5606H03.24H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(5606H03.29H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Walker)--(5606H03.40H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(5606H03.15H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5606H03.12H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shull)--(5606H03.47H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Jones)--(5606H03.42H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(5606H03.23H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(5606H03.46H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Wood)--(5606H03.45H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Entlicher)--(5606H03.32H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pike)--(5606H03.37H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Leara)--(5606H03.39H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(5606H03.31H) |
2016-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government w/HCAs 1, 2 & 3 |
2016-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government w/Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(5606S01.02S) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 867-Sater |