MO SB888 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the release of identifying information of lottery winners and allows victims of human trafficking to participate in the Address Confidentiality Program
Title
Prohibits the release of identifying information of lottery winners and allows victims of human trafficking to participate in the Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsors
Sen. Gina Walsh [D] | Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2016-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1 |
2016-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 888-Walsh |