MO SB916 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 916-Schaefer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 916-Schaefer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definitions in the Missouri Human Rights Act
Title
Modifies definitions in the Missouri Human Rights Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 916-Schaefer |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 916-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=24431563 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB916.pdf |