MO SB932 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to bonded entities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to bonded entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 932 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 932 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-12 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2016-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(5992H02.06H) |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(5992H02.01F) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Banking |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Banking |
2016-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Banking |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Banking |
2016-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 932-Cunningham |