MO SB935 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces workers' compensation benefits under certain circumstances based upon marijuana usage
Title
Reduces workers' compensation benefits under certain circumstances based upon marijuana usage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |