MO SB947 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates regulations for insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network company drivers
Title
Creates regulations for insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network company drivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 947 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance |
2016-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Property, Casualty and Life Insurance |
2016-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | S First Read--SB 947-Parson |