MO SB953 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the schedules of controlled substances and hemp extract
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the schedules of controlled substances and hemp extract
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (6099S.03C) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 953-Sater |