MO SCR24 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to rescind its newly published rule regarding hours of service and refrain from adopting regulations concerning sleep apnea and other measures affecting the trucking industry
Title
Urges the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to rescind its newly published rule regarding hours of service and refrain from adopting regulations concerning sleep apnea and other measures affecting the trucking industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H adopted | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-08 | Hearing Cancelled H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-02 | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Reported to the House | |
2012-03-07 | S adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-29 | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-02-23 | S Offered |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2580635 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR24.pdf |