MO SCR25 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 25-Cunningham, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 25-Cunningham, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the State Innovation Waiver Task Force
Title
Establishes the State Innovation Waiver Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 25-Cunningham, with SCS (pending) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Motion to adopt SCS S withdrawn |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Corrected Committee Report to reflection the adoption of SCS |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (2386S.05C) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 25-Cunningham |