MO SCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes the societal harms brought by pornography and the need for education, prevention, research, and policy change

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes the societal harms brought by pornography and the need for education, prevention, research, and policy change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateH Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
2019-05-13SenateReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-13SenateVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-09SenateReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-09SenateReported Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-05-09SenateVoted Do Pass H Judiciary
2019-05-07SenateHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2019-04-17SenateReferred H Judiciary
2019-03-27SenateH Second Read
2019-03-26SenateH First Read
2019-03-26SenateS adopted
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-12SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-05SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-15SenateReferred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-14SenateS Offered--SCR 3-Emery

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback