MO SCR31 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to reinstate the Secure Rural Schools program
Title
Urges Congress to reinstate the Secure Rural Schools program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | H adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2015-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2015-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | S adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-09 | Senate | S offered--SCR 31-Cunningham |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=5929893 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR31.pdf |