MO SCR35 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by House Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Signed by House Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves the new values for agricultural and horticultural property filed with the Secretary of State's Office on December 21, 2009, by the State Tax Commission
Title
Disapproves the new values for agricultural and horticultural property filed with the Secretary of State's Office on December 21, 2009, by the State Tax Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-02-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-02-18 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Referred H Agri-Business Committee | |
2010-02-02 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-01 | H First Read | |
2010-01-28 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-01-28 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-01-28 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(4145S02.01S) | |
2010-01-27 | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-01-26 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SCRs 35 & 32) S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (4145S.02C) | |
2010-01-19 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-12 | S First Read--SCR 35-Stouffer, et al |