MO SCR37 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Insurance Policy Committee
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Insurance Policy Committee
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Missouri's Attorney General to investigate the constitutionality of the Nebraska Compromise to federal health care legislation
Title
Urges Missouri's Attorney General to investigate the constitutionality of the Nebraska Compromise to federal health care legislation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred H Insurance Policy Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Reported to the House | |
2010-02-08 | SCR, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-02-08 | SSA 1 for SA 1 S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4408S01.03S) | |
2010-02-08 | SA 1 S offered (Callahan)--(4408S01.02S) | |
2010-02-02 | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-02 | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2010-01-13 | S Offered--SCR 37-Schmitt |