MO SJR16 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS#2 for SCS for SJR 16-Kehoe, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS#2 for SCS for SJR 16-Kehoe, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a temporary one cent sales and use tax for transportation purposes
Title
Imposes a temporary one cent sales and use tax for transportation purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] | Sen. Ryan McKenna [D] | Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS#2 for SCS for SJR 16-Kehoe, with HCS, as amended |
2013-05-17 | House | Motion to concur in HCS, as amended, withdrawn |
2013-05-14 | House | Motion to concur in HCS, as amended, withdrawn |
2013-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(1261H09.05H) |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(1261H09.01F) |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred H Transportation Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-25 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(1261S06.02S) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Kehoe)--(1261S.06F) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Resolution Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-03-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Kehoe)--(1261S.04F) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Joint Resolution Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee - (1261S.03C) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 16-Kehoe and McKenna |