MO SJR38 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Missouri state government from recognizing, enforcing, or acting in furtherance of certain actions of the federal government
Title
Prohibits Missouri state government from recognizing, enforcing, or acting in furtherance of certain actions of the federal government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 38-Nieves |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723654 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR38.pdf |