MO SJR87 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to abortion and assistance to pregnant women and families
Title
Creates provisions relating to abortion and assistance to pregnant women and families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | S First Read |