MO SR2062 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SR 2062-Pearce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SR 2062-Pearce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the United States Air Force to support basing and operating aircraft at Whiteman Air Force Base
Title
Urges the United States Air Force to support basing and operating aircraft at Whiteman Air Force Base
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SR 2062-Pearce |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-26 | Senate | S Offered--SR 2062-Pearce |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=37243521 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SR2062.pdf |