MS HB1015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of The Fees For The Reinstatement Of Suspended Or Revoked Driver's Licenses And Provide For The Distribution Of The Reinstatement Fees For Various Purposes; To Amend Section 63-1-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Furnish Either A Permanent Driver's License Kiosk Or A Driver's License Examiner In Every County Seat At Least One Day Per Month If Requested By The Board Of Supervisors; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Driver's license reinstatement fees; increase and provide for the distribution of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Collins,Brown,Wilemon |
2013-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Moak |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Chism |
2013-03-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-15 | House | Amended |
2013-02-15 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hood, Smith (39th), Rogers (61st)) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-13 | House | Amended |
2013-02-06 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |