MS HB1025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Conference Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Conference Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Eliminate The Position Of Executive Deputy Commissioner From The Department Of Corrections; To Amend Section 47-5-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Corrections; eliminate executive deputy commissioner from.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Johnson,Sparks,Barnett |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Horan,Rushing |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Government Structure |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-04 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To CN |
2024-02-22 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To AC |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred To Corrections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 5 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |