MS HB1078 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 37-11-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Office Of Healthy Schools Of The State Department Of Education To Develop And Implement The Healthier School Initiative To Promote Healthier School Environments, To Require The Office To Provide Financial Incentives To Schools Receiving Recognition Through The Healthierus School Challenge, To Provide Financial Awards, Subject To Legislative Appropriation, For Schools Receiving Certain Levels Of Recognition, To Require Local School Districts To Include Information Relevant To The Healthierus School Challenge On Their District Web Sites, To Require The Office To Provide Technical Assistance To Schools That Elect To Participate In The Challenge To Become A Healthierus School, To Establish The Criteria Required To Be Met By Schools Participating In The Challenge, To Require An Application For Certification As A Healthierus School To Be Submitted To The State Department Of Education For Review By The Office Of Healthy Schools, To Require The Office To Forward Approved Applications To The United States Department Of Agriculture For Consideration, And To Authorize Schools To Modify An Application That Is Not Approved By The Office; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Healthier School Initiative; require the State Department of Education to implement to incentivize schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-15 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Education | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-08 | Passed | |
2010-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Education |