MS HB1083 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-7-173, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definitions Of "capital Expenditure," "change Of Ownership," And "health Services" For The Purposes Of The Health Care Certificate Of Need Law; To Amend Sections 41-7-193 And 41-7-197, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Department Of Health To Review Applications For A Certificate Of Need And The State Health Officer To Issue A Final Order Regarding The Application Within Certain Time Periods; To Amend Section 41-7-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Provisions For Appeals Of Final Orders Of The Department Regarding A Certificate Of Need; To Amend Section 41-7-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For A Determination Of Reviewability By The Department Upon Applications For Certain Services Or Activities For Which The Certificate Of Need Law Is Potentially Applicable; And For Related Purposes.
Title
CON; revise certain definitions and procedures regarding review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-02-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holland, Mims, Johnson (87th)) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-17 | House | DR - TSDPCS: GB To PH |
2016-02-16 | House | DR - TSDPCS: PH To GB |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Revenue and Expenditure General Bills |