MS HB1090 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-29-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "paraphernalia" Under The Uniform Controlled Substances Law To Exclude Any Materials Used Or Intended For Use In Testing For The Presence Of Other Emerging Or Existing Drug Threats Of Concern To Public Health As Identified By The State Department Of Health; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Paraphernalia; revise definition under the Uniform Controlled Substances Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Turner-Ford,Boyd,Sparks |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Hobgood-Wilkes,Bell (65th),Burch |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: DP To JB |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B |
2024-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred To Drug Policy |